Financial history CHERRY TREE PLAYGROUP (RAWTENSTALL)

Charity number: 1040941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £57.17k £60.83k £64.44k £65.64k £78.73k
Total expenditure £72.83k £61.49k £61.42k £71.83k £67.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £48.95k £56.38k £61.02k N/A £63.24k