Financial history The Switch Charity Limited

Charity number: 1040962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £981.74k £908.26k £1.03m £1.09m £1.15m
Total expenditure £971.18k £1.04m £1.09m £1.04m £1.05m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £25.00k £25.00k £25.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £47.72k £32.72k £29.05k £23.92k £19.13k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £925.03k £870.88k £993.83k £1.05m £1.10m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.99k £4.66k £5.80k £19.15k £35.57k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £971.18k £1.04m £1.09m £1.04m £1.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.07k £8.72k £4.37k £9.69k £12.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0