Financial history GILBERDYKE ST STEPHENS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1040995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.61k £26.84k £23.12k £17.46k £24.67k
Total expenditure £19.72k £12.38k £9.23k £16.38k £18.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.96k £11.04k N/A N/A