Financial history CITIZEN ADVOCACY TRUST GLOUCESTERSHIRE

Charity Number: 1041155
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £161.05k £148.27k £147.69k £128.71k £128.24k
Total expenditure £114.73k £129.92k £143.57k £134.66k £152.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A