Financial history The Dentons UK and Middle East LLP Charitable Trust

Charity Number: 1041204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £163.43k £166.87k £183.88k £187.18k £186.15k
Total expenditure £131.51k £133.21k £175.10k £150.95k £185.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A