Financial history THE DENDROLOGY CHARITABLE COMPANY

Charity number: 1041395
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £35.65k £34.86k £43.17k £70.45k £66.27k
Total expenditure £46.67k £42.46k £61.35k £72.61k £69.08k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A