Financial history FRIENDS OF THE MCILVRIDE MEDICAL PRACTICE

Charity Number: 1041404
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2010 30/04/2011 30/04/2012 30/04/2013 30/04/2014
Total gross income £400 £400 £13 £100 £0
Total expenditure £275 £150 £0 £10 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A