Financial history REGAL AREA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1041414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £39.90k £28.85k £21.00k £24.30k £32.60k
Total expenditure £21.37k £28.93k £17.71k £27.08k £37.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A