Financial history WANDSWORTH WORK AND PLAY

Charity Number: 1041641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £55.88k £51.24k £63.53k £69.90k £86.07k
Total expenditure £51.42k £38.54k £43.14k £40.53k £55.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.57k £11.07k £23.23k £14.35k £25.75k