Financial history ROSE HILL AND DONNINGTON ADVICE CENTRE

Charity number: 1041833
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £87.19k £91.97k £94.81k £102.19k £134.35k
Total expenditure £77.07k £80.48k £87.53k £93.19k £97.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A