Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF EASTON COLLEGE

Charity number: 1042341
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2009 11 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2008 17 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2007 26 March 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2006 21 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2006 Not Required