Accounts and annual returns CHELTENHAM JUNIOR HOCKEY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1042419
Charity reporting is up to date (86 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 25 July 2024 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 25 July 2024 86 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 01 May 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 01 May 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 26 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 26 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 21 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 21 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 24 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window