Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL'S-BOURNEMOUTH
Charity number: 1042607
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 09 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 17 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | 17 November 2015 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | 01 October 2014 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window