Accounts and annual returns TENBY SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB

Charity number: 1042878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 14 March 2025 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 28 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 09 April 2024 103 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 01 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 07 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required