Accounts and annual returns THE BURMA STAR ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1043040
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 June 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 April 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 April 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 April 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 April 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 17 May 2017 On Time