Accounts and annual returns VIETNAMESE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION IN SOUTH WEST LONDON

Charity number: 1043053
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 22 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 28 February 2011 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 17 December 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 13 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 29 January 2010 On Time