Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF COMBE MARTIN SCHOOL

Charity number: 1043093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 23 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 October 2021 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required