Accounts and annual returns RAINOW PRE-SCHOOL
Charity Number: 1043182

Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 October 2024 | 512 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 October 2024 | 512 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 January 2024 | 593 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 14 January 2024 | 593 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 December 2022 | 562 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 14 December 2022 | 562 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 08 May 2022 | 707 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 08 May 2022 | 707 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window