Accounts and annual returns THE KCC FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1043210
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2008 14 October 2009 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 26 October 2009 118 days late
Annual return 31 December 2007 31 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 31 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2006 30 November 2007 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 30 November 2007 153 days late