Accounts and annual returns DRAYCOTT MANOR SCHOOL P T F A

Charity number: 1043348
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 16 July 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 16 July 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 16 July 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 16 July 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 16 July 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 16 July 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 16 July 2005 10 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 July 2005 Not Required
Annual return 16 July 2004 11 May 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 July 2004 Not Required