Financial history ST JOSEPH'S PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1043368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.21k £3.10k £1.69k £4.22k £6.80k
Total expenditure £2.08k £6.04k £7.17k £2.74k £2.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A