Governing document ASSOCIATION OF STOMA CARE NURSES UK

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1990 AND AMENDED 8 SEPTEMBER 1993, 7 SEPTEMBER 1994, 13 SEPTEMBER 2002, 5 SEPTEMBER 2003, 9 SEPTEMBER 2004 AND 27 SEPTEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION OF NAME CHANGE DATED 8 OCTOBER 2012 as amended on 12 Nov 2020 as amended on 26 Oct 2022 as amended on 30 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ART AND SCIENCE OF STOMA SURGERY CARE NURSING (AND RELATED CONDITIONS) AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR NURSES AND OTHERS ENGAGED IN SUCH CARE TO FURTHER THEIR EDUCATION AND SKILLS IN THE PROFESSION OF STOMA THERAPY CARE NURSING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.