Financial history DALE PARK YOUTH ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1043960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £12.78k £7.65k £12.10k £18.05k £18.05k
Total expenditure £11.26k £7.08k £12.41k £21.33k £21.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.05k N/A £2.00k N/A N/A