Accounts and annual returns ASH LEA SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1044249
Charity reporting is up to date (243 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 February 2025 243 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 February 2025 243 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 02 September 2022 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 02 September 2022 64 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 July 2021 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 July 2021 28 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 July 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required