Accounts and annual returns BUSINESS WISE (UK) LIMITED

Charity number: 1044327
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 11 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 19 February 2008 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 28 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 12 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required