Financial history THE MUSTARD TREE

Charity number: 1044349
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £124.00k £156.84k £149.05k £183.06k £241.79k
Total expenditure £144.47k £142.66k £168.63k £161.20k £205.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A