Accounts and annual returns WINDLE PILKINGTON YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 1044405
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 April 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 April 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 29 April 2005 12 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 April 2005 Not Required
Annual return 29 April 2004 21 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 April 2004 Not Required