Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF REDBOURN INFANTS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1044487
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 12 October 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2016 12 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 12 December 2016 On Time