Financial history BCM INTERNATIONAL UK (ANCHOR) TRUST

Charity Number: 1044539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £104.87k £81.35k £43.54k £64.75k £67.94k
Total expenditure £127.78k £110.03k £70.55k £94.32k £98.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A