Financial history CLIFFEDALE SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 1044738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £17.37k £7.13k £591 £7.15k £7.44k
Total expenditure £28.65k £3.84k £4.17k £11.59k £2.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A