Financial history QUEEN ELEANOR SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1044765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £623 £4 £233 £997 £168
Total expenditure £2.15k £178 £1.50k £1.30k £503
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A