Financial history DISABILITY RECREATION UNITY MOVEMENT

Charity number: 1044836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £139.12k £216.20k £167.06k £224.58k £242.99k
Total expenditure £142.26k £141.88k £164.61k £185.48k £201.71k
Income from government contracts N/A £52.14k £83.77k £140.69k £135.83k
Income from government grants £52.62k £112.48k £1.20k £500 £500