Accounts and annual returns Harefield Infant and Junior Schools PTA

Charity number: 1044958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 13 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 18 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 August 2022 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 August 2022 403 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required