Trustees THE TORBAY U. 3. A.

Charity number: 1045085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Hackwith Trustee 04 April 2024
None on record
John Hough Trustee 01 February 2024
None on record
David James Campbell Trustee 08 March 2023
None on record
Marilyn May Ham Trustee 03 November 2022
None on record
Karen Avis Daly Trustee 09 March 2022
None on record
Gwen Smith Trustee 07 October 2021
None on record
Kathleen Parsons Trustee 09 August 2021
None on record
Peter Snowden Trustee 03 August 2016
None on record