Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF LOCKING COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1045142
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 August 2024 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 01 August 2023 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 July 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required