Financial history HUDDERSFIELD YMCA

Charity number: 1045292
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/05/2018
Total gross income £404.92k £361.36k £344.77k £368.85k £288.51k
Total expenditure £494.45k £477.03k £435.73k £391.28k £303.10k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A