Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ROXWELL SCHOOL (FORS)

Charity number: 1045295
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2014 24 November 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2013 11 November 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2012 21 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2011 22 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not Required