Financial history ST ANDREW'S PLAYGROUP (HALIFAX)

Charity Number: 1045454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £59.04k £70.93k £80.15k £84.93k £135.73k
Total expenditure £58.52k £53.68k £67.27k £79.18k £84.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £49.34k £64.70k £69.86k £65.88k £112.63k