Financial history ROBERT BATCHELOR MUSIC TRUST

Charity Number: 1045504
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/02/2009 27/02/2010 27/02/2011 27/02/2012 27/02/2013
Total gross income £683 £540 £780 £202 £52
Total expenditure £215 £242 £358 £199 £4.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A