Financial history BRIGHT START PRE - SCHOOL

Charity number: 1045744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £149.54k £197.65k £262.46k £226.34k £258.97k
Total expenditure £145.78k £222.67k £192.04k £182.00k £211.98k
Income from government contracts N/A £93.75k £135.69k £135.64k £156.77k
Income from government grants £550 N/A N/A N/A N/A