Accounts and annual returns DARTS (DARTFORD AID FOR RESEARCH AND TRAINING IN SURGERY)

Charity number: 1045745
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 August 2019 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required