Accounts and annual returns THACKER WOODS AWARD

Charity Number: 1045760
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 10 March 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 27 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 17 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required