Accounts and annual returns SETTLE C E PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1045866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 September 2024 225 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 February 2023 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required