Accounts and annual returns BEELINE COMMUNITY CAR SERVICE

Charity number: 1045957
Charity reporting is up to date (69 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 April 2025 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 April 2025 434 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required