Financial history JOSEPH ROWNTREE SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1046093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £73.86k £81.01k £87.92k £87.53k £267.14k
Total expenditure £67.88k £135.19k £86.03k £76.03k £246.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A