Accounts and annual returns PRIMARY CARE DERMATOLOGY SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1046172
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 13 December 2006 43 days late
Annual return 31 December 2004 22 December 2005 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 16 November 2005 16 days late