Financial history THE RED BALLOON PRE-SCHOOL GROUP

Charity number: 1046327
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £72.98k £70.80k £67.22k £60.35k £50.00k
Total expenditure £59.93k £58.98k £61.61k £77.17k £68.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A