Accounts and annual returns SOUTHDOWN

Charity number: 1046368
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 17 June 2011 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 15 June 2010 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required