Financial history THE FRIENDS OF LAWN PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1046420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £10.43k £6.25k £2.38k £5.04k £15.60k
Total expenditure £7.29k £5.13k £7.26k £3.86k £20.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A