Accounts and annual returns TYWARDREATH CP SCHOOL PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1046441
Charity reporting is up to date (114 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 October 2024 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 October 2023 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 July 2022 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required